VA HB1910 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0462)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0462)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Cambridge Advanced (A/AS) Exams; course credit. Requires the governing boards of each public institution of higher education to implement policies regarding the granting of credit for Cambridge Advanced (A/AS) examinations. The bill also provides that each institution's policy for course credit for Cambridge Advanced (A/AS) courses must be comparable to its policies for granting course credit for Advanced Placement courses.
Title
Cambridge Advanced Exams; course credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (79-Y 20-N) (Y: 81 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (79-Y 20-N) (Y: 81 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0462) | |
2011-03-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 462 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-28 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-26 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-25 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1910ER) | |
2011-02-25 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-17 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-07 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (79-Y 20-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read third time and passed House (79-Y 20-N) | |
2011-02-06 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2011-02-04 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1910H1 | |
2011-02-04 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11105000D-H1 | |
2011-02-04 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-03 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-02 | House: Committee substitute printed 11105000D-H1 | |
2011-02-02 | House: Reported from Education with substitute (16-Y 6-N) | |
2011-02-01 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 1-N) | |
2011-01-18 | House: Assigned Education sub: #4 Higher Education and Arts | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101842D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1448 (Same As) 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0545)