VA HB1930 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0737)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0737)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Institutions of higher education; reporting acts of sexual violence. Requires any responsible employee of a public or private nonprofit institution of higher education who in the course of his employment obtains information that an act of sexual violence has been committed against a student or on campus property or other property related to the institution to report such information to the Title IX coordinator for the institution as soon as practicable. The bill requires the Title IX coordinator to report such information to a review committee, which shall meet within 72 hours of the receipt of information of an alleged act of sexual violence and which shall include the Title IX coordinator, a representative of law enforcement, and a student affairs representative. If the review committee determines that disclosure of the information regarding the alleged act of sexual violence is necessary to protect the health and safety of the victim or other individuals, the representative of law enforcement on the review committee shall disclose the information, including personally identifiable information, to the law-enforcement agency responsible for investigating the alleged act. In cases involving a felony sexual assault, the representative of law enforcement on the review committee, or in certain situations, another committee member, shall consult with the local attorney for the Commonwealth or other prosecutor responsible for prosecuting the alleged act of sexual violence. The bill requires the governing board of each public or private nonprofit institution of higher education to (i) establish a written memorandum of understanding with a local sexual assault crisis center or other victim support service and (ii) adopt policies to provide victims with information on contacting such center or service. The bill requires each public or private nonprofit institution of higher education to annually certify to the State Council of Higher Education for Virginia that it has reviewed its sexual violence policy. Finally, the bill requires the Department of Criminal Justice Services to monitor the impact the legislation will have on the workload of local victim witness programs and report its findings to the Chairmen of the House and Senate Committees for Courts of Justice by October 1, 2016.
Title
Higher educational institutions; review committees, reporting of acts of sexual violence, report.
Sponsors
Del. David Albo [R] | Del. Robert Bell [R] | Del. Todd Gilbert [R] | Del. Robert Marshall [R] |
Del. James Massie [R] | Del. Thomas Rust [R] | Del. Mark Keam [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 101 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 3-N) (Y: 99 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (13-Y 3-N) (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 101 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 3-N) (Y: 99 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (13-Y 3-N) (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0737) | |
2015-04-15 | House | Enacted, Chapter 737 (effective 7/1/15) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB1930ER2) |
2015-04-15 | House | Reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-04-15 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (96-Y 0-N) |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-27 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1930ER) |
2015-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-27 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-27 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (94-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-27 | House | Conference substitute printed 15105667D-H3 |
2015-02-27 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senators: Smith, Black, Cosgrove |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2015-02-26 | House | Delegates: Bell, Robert B., Massie, Toscano |
2015-02-26 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2015-02-26 | House | House acceded to request |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 15105308D-S1 (0-Y 99-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1930S1 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15105308D-S1 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15105308D-S1 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-10 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 3-N) |
2015-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (97-Y 3-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Engrossed by House - floor substitute HB1930H2 |
2015-02-09 | House | Substitute by Delegate Bell, Robert B. agreed to 15104931D-H2 |
2015-02-09 | House | Committee substitute rejected 15104830D-H1 |
2015-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-09 | House | Floor substitute printed 15104931D-H2 (Bell, Robert B.) |
2015-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-05 | House | Committee substitute printed 15104830D-H1 |
2015-02-05 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (13-Y 3-N) |
2015-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2015-02-05 | House | Referred from Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2015-01-20 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103292D |
Same As/Similar To
SB712 (Same As) 2015-04-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0745)