VA HB1939 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0464)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0464)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Regulations promulgated when mandated by statute; requirements. Requires agencies, for regulatory changes that are nondiscretionary and necessary to conform to a change in law, to file the updated regulations with the Registrar of Regulations within 90 days of the law's effective date. The bill also requires the filing of a Notice of Intended Regulatory Action within 120 days of a law's effective date whenever a Virginia statutory change necessitates a change to, or repeal of, all or a portion of a regulation, or the adoption of a new regulation.
Title
Administrative Process Act; timing for filing certain regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0464) | |
2011-03-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 464 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-28 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-26 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-25 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1939ER) | |
2011-02-25 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-08 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1939H1 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11104912D-H1 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-06 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-03 | House: Committee substitute printed 11104912D-H1 | |
2011-02-03 | House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-01 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-17 | House: Assigned GL sub: #4 Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103141D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 4007.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4012 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4013 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |