VA HB1939 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Neighborhood assistance tax credits. Changes the Neighborhood Assistance Act Tax Credit Program by (i) reducing the tax credit from 65 to 60 percent of the value of donations to neighborhood organizations and (ii) increasing the annual cap on the value of donations by individuals that are eligible for credit from the first $125,000 of value to the first $135,500 of value. The provisions of the bill would become effective beginning with taxable year 2016.
Title
Neighborhood assistance; reduces tax credit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Left in Finance |
2015-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-01-20 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2015-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103237D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 439.21 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.24 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB1939 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB1939+hil |