VA HB197 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0647)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0647)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Supplementary written materials on documents of Virginia history and the United States Constitution. Requires teachers to ensure that all supplementary written materials used to teach the Declaration of American Independence, the general principles of the Constitution of the United States, including the Bill of Rights, the Virginia Statute of Religious Freedom, the charters of the Virginia Company of April 10, 1606, May 23, 1609, and March 12, 1612, and the Virginia Declaration of Rights contain accurate restatements of the principles contained in these documents and directs the Department of Education to develop guidelines for such supplementary written materials used by teachers. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Virginia history and United States Constitution; supplementary written materials on documents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (70-Y 28-N) (Y: 72 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Education (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (70-Y 28-N) (Y: 72 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Education (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0647) | |
2014-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 647 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB197ER) |
2014-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-06 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (70-Y 28-N) |
2014-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House (70-Y 28-N) |
2014-02-05 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-03 | House | Reported from Education (16-Y 6-N) |
2014-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) |
2014-01-20 | House | Assigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education |
2013-12-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2013-12-26 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100411D |