VA HB1989 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Tabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Extended Employment Services. Removes the eligibility of individuals with a significant disability to receive Extended Employment Services. Under current law, Extended Employment Services are available to individuals with a significant disability or a most significant disability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extended Employment Services; removes eligibility of individuals with a significant disability.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 1-N) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseTabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
2019-01-15HouseSubcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 1-N)
2019-01-11HouseAssigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3
2019-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2019-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102929D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
515169.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback