VA HB2007 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Protective orders; assault and battery; penalty. Provides that a person who is the subject of a protective order who commits an assault and battery resulting in bodily injury on the person protected by the order is guilty of a Class 6 felony. Currently, the assault and battery must result in serious bodily injury in order for the offense to be punishable as a Class 6 felony.
Title
Protective orders; assault and battery, penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2015-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-02-06 | House | Assigned App. sub: Public Safety |
2015-02-04 | House | Incorporates HB2301 |
2015-02-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-02-04 | House | Committee substitute printed 15104748D-H1 |
2015-02-04 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-30 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-01-14 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101981D |