VA HB2011 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0791)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0791)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Motor Vehicle Dealer Board. Allows the Commissioner of Agriculture and Consumer Services to designate someone to serve in his place on the Motor Vehicle Dealer Board. The bill also requires motor vehicle dealers, T&M vehicle dealers, trailer dealers, and motorcycle dealers to have Internet connections and email addresses and sets fees for reprinting licenses, certificates, and registrations and for reinstating licenses, certificates, and registrations that have been suspended. Further, it requires dealers to keep records of safety inspections performed on vehicles sold at retail and to retain completed original buyer's orders for five years instead of the present four years.
Title
Motor Vehicle Dealer Board; motor vehicle dealers to have Internet connections, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of dispensing with constitutional reading agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passed by for the day agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of dispensing with constitutional reading agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passed by for the day agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0791) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Enacted, Chapter 791 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB2011ER2) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-06 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-06 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-05 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-03-26 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2011-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-03 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2011ER) | |
2011-03-03 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-23 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-23 | House: Senate substitute agreed to by House 11105484D-S1 (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-22 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-22 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute HB2011S1 | |
2011-02-22 | Senate: Substitute by Senator Deeds agreed to 11105484D-S1 | |
2011-02-22 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2011-02-22 | Senate: Floor substitute printed 11105484D-S1 (Deeds) | |
2011-02-22 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Reconsideration of dispensing with constitutional reading agreed to (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Reconsideration of passed by for the day agreed to (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed, passed by for the day (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-17 | Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 1-N) | |
2011-01-25 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2011-01-25 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-01-24 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-24 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-21 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2011H1 | |
2011-01-21 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11104289D-H1 | |
2011-01-21 | House: Read second time | |
2011-01-20 | House: Read first time | |
2011-01-18 | House: Committee substitute printed 11104289D-H1 | |
2011-01-18 | House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-17 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-14 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #1 | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101297D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 1503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1510 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1519 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1529 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1530 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |