VA HB2013 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; definition of confectionery. Defines "confectionery," as used in the Alcoholic Beverage Control Act, as sweet foods, including baked goods, candies, jams, jellies, puddings, ice creams, sorbets, and yogurts.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; definition of confectionery.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in General Laws |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | House | Reconsidered by GL Subcommittee #3 |
2019-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-14 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2019-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2019-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101438D |