VA HB2020 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-15 - Failed to report (defeated) in Transportation (6-Y 7-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-15 - Failed to report (defeated) in Transportation (6-Y 7-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Issuance of temporary licenses, permits, or special identification cards; requirements. Allows the issuance of a temporary driver's license, permit, or special identification card to an applicant presenting valid documentary evidence that a federal court or federal agency having jurisdiction over immigration has authorized the applicant to be in the United States for a period of at least 30 days from the date of application. The bill specifices which applicants are eligible for such license, permit, or card.
Title
Temporary driver's licenses, permits, or special identification cards; requirements for issuance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in Transportation (6-Y 7-N) (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (70-Y 27-N) (Y: 70 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (70-Y 27-N) (Y: 70 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-15 | Senate | Failed to report (defeated) in Transportation (6-Y 7-N) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Committee amendments |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-07 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (70-Y 27-N) |
2017-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House (70-Y 27-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Printed as engrossed 17105161D-EH1 |
2017-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendments HB2020EH1 |
2017-02-06 | House | Amendments by Delegate Villanueva agreed to |
2017-02-06 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17105161D-H1 |
2017-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-06 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2017-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-02 | House | Committee substitute printed 17105161D-H1 |
2017-02-02 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (12-Y 2-N) |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102050D |