VA HB2025 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - House sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - House sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Religious freedom; solemnization of marriage. Provides that no person shall be (i) required to participate in the solemnization of any marriage or (ii) subject to any penalty by the Commonwealth, or its political subdivisions or representatives or agents, solely on account of such person's belief, speech, or action in accordance with a sincerely held religious belief or moral conviction that marriage is or should be recognized as the union of one man and one woman. The bill defines "person" as any (a) religious organization; (b) organization supervised by or controlled by or operated in connection with a religious organization; (c) individual employed by a religious organization while acting in the scope of his paid or volunteer employment; (d) successor, representative, agent, agency, or instrumentality of any of the foregoing; or (e) clergy member or minister. The bill also defines "penalty." This bill is identical to SB 1324.
Title
Religious freedom; solemnization of marriage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (54-Y 38-N) (Y: 54 N: 38 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (20-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (57-Y 37-N) (Y: 57 N: 37 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (20-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (57-Y 37-N) (Y: 57 N: 37 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | House | House sustained Governor's veto |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-03-23 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2017-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-28 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/28/17 |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-23 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2025ER) |
2017-02-23 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-20 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (54-Y 38-N) |
2017-02-20 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (54-Y 38-N) |
2017-02-20 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (21-Y 19-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (20-Y 19-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (8-Y 7-N) |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-02 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (57-Y 37-N) |
2017-02-02 | House | Read third time and passed House (57-Y 37-N) |
2017-02-01 | House | Printed as engrossed 17102190D-E |
2017-02-01 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2025E |
2017-02-01 | House | Amendment by Delegate Freitas agreed to |
2017-02-01 | House | Read second time |
2017-01-31 | House | Passed by for the day |
2017-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-26 | House | Reported from General Laws (14-Y 8-N) |
2017-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) |
2017-01-16 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102190D |