VA HB2044 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-24 - Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Medical records; subpoena duces tecum; additional time to comply. Provides that a health care provider may make a written request to the party requesting the subpoena duces tecum or the party on whose behalf the subpoena was issued for such party's consent to an additional seven days within which to comply with such subpoena, which consent shall not be unreasonably withheld, provided such subpoena was served within 15 days of the return date and provided such additional time does not adversely affect a party's ability to timely prepare for trial, depositions, or such other proceeding.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical records; subpoena duces tecum, additional time to comply.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 94-N) (Y: 0 N: 94 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (34-Y 4-N) (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (9-Y 5-N 1-A) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-24HouseFailed to pass in House
2019-02-24HouseNo further action taken
2019-02-21SenateSenators: Obenshain, Petersen, Peake
2019-02-21SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-20HouseDelegates: McGuire, Bell, Robert B., Bourne
2019-02-20HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-20HouseHouse acceded to request
2019-02-19SenateSenate requested conference committee
2019-02-19SenateSenate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-15HouseVOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 94-N)
2019-02-15HouseSenate substitute rejected by House 19106775D-S1 (0-Y 94-N)
2019-02-15HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-13SenatePassed Senate with substitute (34-Y 4-N)
2019-02-13SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2044S1
2019-02-13SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19106775D-S1
2019-02-13SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-13SenateRead third time
2019-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (9-Y 5-N 1-A)
2019-02-11SenateCommittee substitute printed 19106775D-S1
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2044H1
2019-02-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106180D-H1
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-02-01HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106180D-H1
2019-02-01HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-10HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-07HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102164D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
801413(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2044
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2044+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2044H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2044S1+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0802V0062+HB2044
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0105+HB2044
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2364+HB2044
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0244+HB2044
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0538HB2044+HB2044
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0585HB2044+HB2044
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2873+HB2044
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0785HB2044+HB2044

Bill Comments

feedback