VA HB2047 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0735)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Oyster-planting grounds; municipal dredging projects; compensation. Extends the duration of an exception, for municipal dredging, to the right of a person to lease oyster-planting grounds, and establishes a procedure for determining compensation to such a leaseholder when his grounds are disturbed by such a dredging project.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oyster planting grounds; municipal dredging projects.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0735)
2019-03-21 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 735 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-22SenateSigned by President
2019-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-22HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2047ER)
2019-02-22HouseEnrolled
2019-02-19SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19SenateRead third time
2019-02-18SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2019-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-29HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28HousePrinted as engrossed 19103694D-E
2019-01-28HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2047E
2019-01-28HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-01-28HouseRead second time
2019-01-25HouseRead first time
2019-01-23HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 0-N)
2019-01-16HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #3
2019-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2019-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103694D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
282618(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2047
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2047+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2047E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2047ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0735+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0103V0006+HB2047
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H01V0018+HB2047
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV1942+HB2047
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S01V0091+HB2047
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0772HB2047+HB2047
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0822HB2047+HB2047

Bill Comments

feedback