VA HB2070 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Tax deduction for energy saving products. Establishes a tax deduction for the amount a taxpayer pays for energy saving products, not to exceed $10,000. Energy saving products are defined as being either (i) solar panels or (ii) products that meet the requirements of the Energy Star program established by the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency and the U.S. Department of Energy. To qualify for the deduction, the taxpayer must spend at least $1,000 on energy saving products. The bill also provides that a person may not claim both this deduction and the existing deduction for certain energy efficient products during the same taxable year.
Title
Energy saving products; tax deduction.
Sponsors
Sen. John Bell [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Finance |
2019-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-22 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102583D |