VA HB2089 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0613)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Sex Offender and Crimes Against Minors Registry; reregistration schedule. Changes the dates for required reregistration of persons on the Sex Offender and Crimes Against Minors Registry (the Registry) from a repeating specified number of days after initial registration to time periods corresponding to such person's birth month and the first letter of such person's last name. The time intervals for reregistration for each of the following four categories of reregistration do not materially change. The bill provides that (i) a person required to register, other than those persons convicted of a sexually violent offense or murder, shall reregister once each year during such person's birth month; current law is once each year from the date of initial registration; (ii) a person convicted of a sexually violent offense or murder shall reregister every three months, beginning in such person's birth month; current law is every 90 days from the date of initial registration; (iii) a person convicted of providing false information or failing to provide registration information, but not convicted of a sexually violent offense or murder, shall reregister every six months beginning with such person's birth month; current law is every 180 days from the date of such conviction; and (iv) a person convicted of providing false information or failing to provide registration information, when such person was included in the Registry for a sexually violent offense or murder, shall reregister every month; current law is every 30 days from the date of such conviction. The bill requires persons with a last name beginning with A through L to register from the first to the fifteenth of each required reporting month and persons with last names M through Z to register from the sixteenth to the last day of the month of each required reporting month. The bill also requires that for the period of July 1, 2020, to July 1, 2021, any person required to reregister shall continue to reregister with the State Police on such person's reregistration schedule in place prior to July 1, 2020, until such person has reregistered pursuant to the new reregistration schedule, at which time such person shall continue reregistering with the new schedule. The bill has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2020. This bill is identical to SB 1418.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sex Offender and Crimes Against Minors Registry; reregistration schedule.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 97-N) (Y: 0 N: 97 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0613)
2019-03-19 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 613 (effective 7/1/20)
2019-03-11 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-11HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019
2019-03-09SenateSigned by President
2019-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-07HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2089ER)
2019-03-07HouseEnrolled
2019-02-22HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-22HouseConference report agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-22 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2019-02-22SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21SenateSenators: McDougle, Obenshain, Petersen
2019-02-21SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-21HouseDelegates: Watts, Leftwich, Ransone
2019-02-21HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-21HouseHouse acceded to request
2019-02-20SenateSenate requested conference committee
2019-02-20SenateSenate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 97-N)
2019-02-19HouseSenate substitute rejected by House 19107088D-S1 (0-Y 97-N)
2019-02-19HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-18SenatePassed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2089S1
2019-02-18SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19107088D-S1
2019-02-18SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-18SenateRead third time
2019-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13SenateCommittee substitute printed 19107088D-S1
2019-02-13SenateReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2089H1
2019-02-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105611D-H1
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-02-01HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105611D-H1
2019-02-01HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
2019-01-10HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-07HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102537D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
91904(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2089
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2089+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2089H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2089S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2089ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0613+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0129+HB2089
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2370+HB2089
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0300+HB2089
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0724HB2089+HB2089
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0743HB2089+HB2089
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3052+HB2089
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0849HB2089+HB2089
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1058HB2089+HB2089
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3315+HB2089

Bill Comments

feedback