VA HB2102 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0757)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0757)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Uniform Commercial Code - Secured Transactions; filings. Provides that a filing under Article 8.9A of the Uniform Commercial Code does not occur with respect to an initial financing statement or amendment thereto that the State Corporation Commission refuses to file on grounds that such a record is not created pursuant to Article 8.9A, is materially false or fraudulent, is presented for an improper purpose, or indicates that the debtor and secured party are substantially the same person or that the record was transmitted by an individual debtor. If a record should have been rejected for any of these reasons, the record shall be deemed void and ineffective and the filing office may remove it from the index. Other changes conform terminology regarding persons falsely identified in a financing statement filed with the office of the clerk of the Commission.
Title
Uniform Commercial Code; secured transactions, filing of documents, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0757) | |
2013-04-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 757 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2013-04-03 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2013-04-03 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB2102ER2) |
2013-04-03 | House | Reenrolled |
2013-04-03 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-04-03 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2013-04-03 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N) |
2013-04-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-03-12 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2102ER) |
2013-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-30 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-29 | House | Printed as engrossed 13101767D-E |
2013-01-29 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2102E |
2013-01-29 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2013-01-29 | House | Read second time |
2013-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-24 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (21-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2013-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101767D |