VA HB211 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0970)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0970)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Special license plate; Air Medal. Creates a special license plate for persons awarded the Air Medal or for unremarried surviving spouses of such persons. An annual $10 fee, in addition to the prescribed cost of state license plates, will be charged for each set of such plates issued.
Title
License plates, special; issuance for persons awarded the United States Air Medal, etc.
Sponsors
Del. Chris Hurst [D] | Del. Dan Helmer [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (92-Y 0-N) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0970) | |
2020-04-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 970 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB211ER) |
2020-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-04 | House | VOTE: Adoption (92-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 20108244D-S1 (92-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB211S1 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20108244D-S1 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20108244D-S1 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-29 | House | VOTE: (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-28 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-23 | House | Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Motor Vehicles |
2019-12-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-12-27 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102690D |