VA HB2113 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-18 - Passed by indefinitely in Finance (16-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-18 - Passed by indefinitely in Finance (16-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Public institutions of higher education; veterans; withdrawal; tuition refund. Requires each public institution of higher education to provide a refund of the tuition and mandatory fees paid by any veteran student for any course from which he is forced to withdraw, for the first time, due to a service-connected medical condition during a semester, as certified in writing to the institution by a physician licensed to practice medicine who treated the veteran student for such medical condition.
Title
Higher educational institutions, public; withdrawal of veteran student.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-18 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Finance (16-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-02-05 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Printed as engrossed 19104079D-E |
2019-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2113E |
2019-02-04 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-30 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-23 | House | Assigned App. sub: Higher Education |
2019-01-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-23 | House | Reported from Education with amendment (20-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-18 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104079D |