VA HB2114 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0568)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0568)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Competitive foods; school-sponsored fundraisers. Requires the regulations setting nutritional guidelines for competitive foods to permit each public school to conduct on school grounds during regular school hours no more than 30 school-sponsored fundraisers per school year during which food that does not meet the nutritional guidelines for competitive foods may be sold to students. "Competitive food" is defined in current law as any food, excluding beverages, sold to students on school grounds during regular school hours that is not part of the school breakfast or school lunch program.
Title
Competitive foods; school-sponsored fundraisers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 5-N) (Y: 96 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (26-Y 12-N) (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 88-N) (Y: 2 N: 90 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (20-Y 17-N 1-A) (Y: 20 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 3-N) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (26-Y 12-N) (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 88-N) (Y: 2 N: 90 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (20-Y 17-N 1-A) (Y: 20 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 3-N) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0568) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 568 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2114ER) |
2015-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (22-Y 17-N) |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (26-Y 12-N) |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2015-02-25 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 5-N) |
2015-02-25 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (94-Y 5-N) |
2015-02-24 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senators: Martin, Carrico, Lewis |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2015-02-23 | House | Delegates: Bell, Richard P., Rust, Keam |
2015-02-23 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2015-02-23 | House | House acceded to request |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Senate insisted on amendments (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-18 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 88-N) |
2015-02-18 | House | Senate amendments rejected by House (2-Y 88-N) |
2015-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (20-Y 17-N 1-A) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendments (10-Y 4-N) |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-05 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 3-N) |
2015-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (94-Y 3-N) |
2015-02-04 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-02 | House | Reported from Education (21-Y 1-N) |
2015-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) |
2015-01-23 | House | Assigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2015-01-14 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100833D |