VA HB2116 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2116
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0216)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0216)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Certain declared states of emergency; priority for personal protective equipment and immunizations; funeral service licensees and funeral service establishment employees; emergency. Provides that in any case in which the Board of Health or Commissioner of Health has made an emergency order or regulation for the purpose of suppressing nuisances dangerous to the public health or a communicable, contagious, or infectious disease or other danger to the public life and health, funeral service licensees and persons employed by a funeral service establishment shall be included in any group afforded priority with regard to (i) access to personal protective equipment and (ii) administration of any vaccination against such communicable disease of public health threat during such emergency. The bill contains an emergency clause. Certain declared states of emergency; priority for personal protective equipment and immunizations; funeral service licensees and funeral service establishment employees; emergency. Provides that in any case in which the Board of Health or Commissioner of Health has made an emergency order or regulation for the purpose of suppressing nuisances dangerous to the public health or a communicable, contagious, or infectious disease or other danger to the public life and health, funeral service licensees and persons employed by a funeral service establishment shall be included in any group afforded priority with regard to (i) access to personal protective equipment and (ii) administration of any vaccination against such communicable disease of public health threat during such emergency. The bill contains an emergency clause.
Title
Funeral service licensees, etc.; priority for personal protective equipment and immunization, etc.
Sponsors
Del. Martha Mugler [D] | Del. Lee Carter [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Ibraheem Samirah [D] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] | Del. Shelly Simonds [D] |
Del. Rodney Willett [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage Emergency (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage Emergency (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0216) | |
2021-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 216 (effective 3/18/21) | |
2021-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-01 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021 |
2021-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2116ER) |
2021-02-25 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-23 | House | VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-23 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 21200160D-S1 (97-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2116S1 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 21200160D-S1 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21200160D-S1 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-26 | House | VOTE: Passage Emergency (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | House | Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-25 | House | Printed as engrossed 21103537D-EH1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Engrossed by House - floor substitute with amendments HB2116EH1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Amendments by Delegate Carter agreed to |
2021-01-25 | House | Substitute by Delegate Mugler agreed to 21103537D-H1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Committee amendments rejected |
2021-01-25 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-22 | House | Floor substitute printed 21103537D-H1 (Mugler) |
2021-01-22 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-21 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (20-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2021-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/13/21 21102718D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2116 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)