VA HB2117 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0130)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0130)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Foster care; time to conduct hearings, etc. Adjusts certain time frames for conducting or petitioning for hearings of a child in foster care and filing foster care plans in order to bring Virginia into compliance with Title IV, Part E (Federal Payments for Foster Care and Adoption Assistance) of the federal Social Security Act. The bill has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2014.
Title
Foster care; time to conduct hearings, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0130) | |
2013-03-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 130 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-15 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-15 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2117ER) |
2013-02-15 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-29 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-29 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-28 | House | Printed as engrossed 13101375D-E |
2013-01-28 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2117E |
2013-01-28 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2013-01-28 | House | Read second time |
2013-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-23 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (17-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-15 | House | Assigned Courts sub: #2 Civil |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101375D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 252 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 253 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 277.02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 278.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 278.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 281 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 282 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 282.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |