VA HB2129 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0287)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0287)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Board of Nursing; application for license or certification; military spouse; expedited review. Requires that the Board of Nursing expedite application processing, to the extent possible, pursuant to current law in cases in which an applicant for licensure or certification is licensed or certified in another state and is relocated to the Commonwealth pursuant to a spouse's official
Title
Nursing, Board of; application for license or certification by military spouse, expedited review.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0287) | |
2019-03-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 287 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-28 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2129ER) |
2019-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-28 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-25 | House | Printed as engrossed 19103622D-E |
2019-01-25 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2129E |
2019-01-25 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2019-01-25 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-22 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103622D |