VA HB2132 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0299)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0299)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Underground Utility Damage Prevention Act. Makes various changes to the Underground Utility Damage Prevention Act. The bill (i) requires excavators to review updates in the 811 positive response system and conduct additional safety verifications before digging, (ii) allows an excavator to schedule a locate request 12 days in advance, (iii) creates a criminal penalty for any person who knowingly and intentionally excavates after being notified by a representative of the Commission of a determination that such excavation constitutes an immediate threat to safety or property and such representative requests that excavation cease, (iv) increases from $2,500 to $10,000 the maximum civil penalty for violations of the Act, and (v) updates notification requirements.
Title
Underground Utility Damage Prevention Act; various changes to Act.
Sponsors
Del. Tony Wilt [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (97-Y 2-N) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (97-Y 2-N) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0299) | |
2023-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 299 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2132ER) |
2023-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-02-07 | House | VOTE: Passage (97-Y 2-N) |
2023-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House (97-Y 2-N) |
2023-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2132H2 |
2023-02-06 | House | Committee Courts of Justice substitute agreed to 23105632D-H2 |
2023-02-06 | House | Committee Commerce and Energy substitute rejected 23105226D-H1 |
2023-02-06 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2023-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-01 | House | Committee substitute printed 23105632D-H2 |
2023-02-01 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-26 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2023-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2023-01-24 | House | Committee substitute printed 23105226D-H1 |
2023-01-24 | House | Reported from Commerce and Energy with substitute (20-Y 2-N) |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy |
2023-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23103931D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1145 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0300)
SB1145 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0300)
SB1145 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0300)