VA HB2140 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Statewide Fire Prevention Code; State Fire Marshal; fees. Changes approval authority over fees that may be charged by the State Fire Marshal to recover enforcement costs from the Board of Housing and Community Development to the Virginia Fire Services Board.
Title
Statewide Fire Prevention Code; fees charged by State Fire Marshal.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | House | Left in General Laws |
2013-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2013-01-14 | House | Assigned GL sub: #1 Housing |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2013-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102695D |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+sum+HB2140 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB2140+hil |