VA HB2143 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0503)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0503)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Provisional ballot envelopes. Specifies that provisional ballot envelopes are to be placed in the ballot container promptly.
Title
Voting; handling of provisional ballot envelope information.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Keam [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0503) | |
2013-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 503 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2143ER) |
2013-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-30 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-29 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2143H1 |
2013-01-29 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 13104556D-H1 |
2013-01-29 | House | Read second time |
2013-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-25 | House | Committee substitute printed 13104556D-H1 |
2013-01-25 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (21-Y 1-N) |
2013-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-14 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Elections Subcommittee |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2013-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102661D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 652 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 653 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |