VA HB2161 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2161
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Active military or a military spouse; prohibits discrimination in public accommodations, etc. Prohibits discrimination in public accommodations, employment, and housing on the basis of a person's military status, defined as a member of the uniformed services of the United States or a reserve component thereof or a spouse or other dependent of the same. The bill also prohibits terms in a rental agreement in which the tenant agrees to waive remedies or rights under the federal Servicemembers Civil Relief Act prior to the occurrence of a dispute between the landlord and the tenant. Active military or a military spouse; prohibits discrimination in public accommodations, etc. Prohibits discrimination in public accommodations, employment, and housing on the basis of a person's military status, defined as a member of the uniformed services of the United States or a reserve component thereof or a spouse or other dependent of the same. The bill also prohibits terms in a rental agreement in which the tenant agrees to waive remedies or rights under the federal Servicemembers Civil Relief Act prior to the occurrence of a dispute between the landlord and the tenant.
Title
Active military or a military spouse; prohibits discrimination in public accommodations, etc.
Sponsors
Del. Kathy Tran [D] | Del. Kelly Convirs-Fowler [D] | Del. Dan Helmer [D] | Del. Kathleen Murphy [D] |
Del. Dawn Adams [D] | Del. Hala Ayala [D] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Mark Cole [R] |
Del. C.E. Hayes [D] | Del. Sally Hudson [D] | Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Michael Mullin [D] | Del. Candi Mundon King [D] | Del. Kenneth Plum [D] |
Del. Marcia Price [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. David Reid [D] | Sen. Danica Roem [D] |
Del. Ibraheem Samirah [D] | Del. Shelly Simonds [D] | Del. Bill Wiley [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-03 | House | VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-02 | House | Engrossed by House - floor substitute HB2161H2 |
2021-02-02 | House | Substitute by Delegate Tran agreed to 21104006D-H2 |
2021-02-02 | House | Committee substitute rejected 21103874D-H1 |
2021-02-02 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-02 | House | Floor substitute printed 21104006D-H2 (Tran) |
2021-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-28 | House | Committee substitute printed 21103874D-H1 |
2021-01-28 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (20-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-27 | House | Assigned GL sub: Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2021-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102352D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2161 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 1500.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 1507 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 1604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 853 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 854 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 965 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2901.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3004 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3900 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3901 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3902 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3904 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3905 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 295.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
55 | 1 | 1208 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
55 | 1 | 1310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |