VA HB2216 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0807)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0807)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Laboratory results; authority to receive directly. Allows a laboratory, with authorization from patient, to provide a copy of the report of the results directly to the insurance carrier, health maintenance organization, or self-insured plan that provides health insurance or similar coverage to the patient.
Title
Laboratory results; authority to provide directly to insurance carrier, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0807) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Enacted, Chapter 807 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB2216ER2) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-06 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-06 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-05 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-03-26 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-22 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-22 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2216ER) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-16 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-16 | House: Senate amendments agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-15 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-11 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-10 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-01-28 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-28 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-27 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2216H1 | |
2011-01-27 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11104652D-H1 | |
2011-01-27 | House: Read second time | |
2011-01-26 | House: Read first time | |
2011-01-25 | House: Committee substitute printed 11104652D-H1 | |
2011-01-25 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2011-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103771D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1116 (Same As) 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0849)