VA HB2229 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-23 - Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-23 - Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Detention and removal of a citizen from the Commonwealth by the federal government. Provides that the Secretary of Public Safety shall request from the U.S. Secretary of Defense that, when an agency of the federal government detains any citizen pursuant to 50 U.S.C. § 1541 as provided by the National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2012 (P.L. 112-81, § 1021 [providing for detention of any person "who planned, authorized, committed, or aided the terrorist attacks that occurred on September 11, 2001, or harbored those responsible for those attacks" or "who was a part of or substantially supported al-Qaeda, the Taliban, or associated forces that are engaged in hostilities against the United States or its coalition partners, including any person who has committed a belligerent act or has directly supported such hostilities in aid of such enemy forces"]), the U.S. Secretary of Defense shall provide notification within 24 hours of the detention to both the Secretary of Public Safety and the chief law-enforcement officer of the locality in which the citizen is detained and that the U.S. Secretary of Defense or his designee shall seek authorization from the chief law-enforcement officer of the locality in which the citizen is detained prior to removal of the citizen from the locality. The bill also provides that if the federal agency detaining any citizen pursuant to the National Defense Authorization Act fails to comply with either such request, funds appropriated for implementation or continuation of memoranda of understanding entered into by cabinet secretaries shall be contingent upon authorization by an act of the General Assembly in a subsequent year. Finally, the bill authorizes the Governor to terminate any memorandum of understanding for noncompliance.
Title
Detention & removal of citizen from State; SPS shall request notification within 24 hours.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute with amendment (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 98-N) (Y: 0 N: 100 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (31-Y 9-N) (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (83-Y 14-N) (Y: 85 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 98-N) (Y: 0 N: 100 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (31-Y 9-N) (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (83-Y 14-N) (Y: 85 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-23 | House | Failed to pass in House |
2013-02-23 | House | No further action taken |
2013-02-21 | House | Delegates: Cline, Fariss, Kory |
2013-02-21 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senators: Carrico, Saslaw, Obenshain |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2013-02-21 | House | House acceded to request |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute with amendment (37-Y 2-N) |
2013-02-21 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 98-N) |
2013-02-21 | House | Senate substitute with amendment rejected by House 13105090D-S1 (0-Y 98-N) |
2013-02-20 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (31-Y 9-N) |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment HB2229S1 |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Carrico agreed to |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 13105090D-S1 |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 13105090D-S1 |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 1-N) |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-02-01 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (83-Y 14-N) |
2013-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House (83-Y 14-N) |
2013-01-31 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2229H1 |
2013-01-31 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 13104522D-H1 |
2013-01-31 | House | Read second time |
2013-01-30 | House | Passed by for the day |
2013-01-29 | House | Passed by for the day |
2013-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-25 | House | Committee substitute printed 13104522D-H1 |
2013-01-25 | House | Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (19-Y 3-N) |
2013-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-22 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: #2 |
2013-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2013-01-11 | House | Presented and ordered printed 13103669D |