VA HB2238 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0509)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0509)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Recorded plats and final site plans. Provides that a site plan shall be deemed final once it has been reviewed and approved by the locality if the only requirements remaining to be satisfied in order to obtain a building permit are the submission of any other administrative documents, agreements, deposits, or fees required by the locality in order to obtain the permit. The bill also amends a 2012 act by adding an enactment that clarifies the validity of previous extensions of valid plats and site plans.
Title
Recorded plats & final site plans; plan shall be deemed final once it has been reviewed & approved.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0509) | |
2013-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 509 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2238ER) |
2013-02-22 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-19 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-19 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Local Government with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-02-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-04 | House | Printed as engrossed 13103120D-E |
2013-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2238E |
2013-02-04 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2013-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-01 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (21-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-18 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: #2 |
2013-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2013-01-14 | House | Presented and ordered printed 13103120D |