VA HB2249 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0033)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0033)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Management agreement between the Commonwealth and College of William and Mary; responsibilities of Building Official. Removes the responsibility for building code compliance at Richard Bland College from the designated Building Official at the College of William and Mary.
Title
William and Mary, The College of; management agreement between the Commonwealth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0033) | |
2013-02-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 33 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-11 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2249ER) |
2013-02-11 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Finance (11-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-29 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-29 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-28 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-23 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-16 | House | Assigned App. sub: Higher Education |
2013-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-01-14 | House | Presented and ordered printed 13101443D |
Same As/Similar To
SB912 (Same As) 2013-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0368)