VA HB2250 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Underground Utility Damage Prevention Act; sanitary districts. Exempts employees of any sanitary district that maintains at least 20 miles of its own streets and roads from certain provisions of the Underground Utility Damage Prevention Act.
Title
Underground Utility Damage Prevention Act; sanitary districts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | House | Left in Transportation |
2013-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2013-01-18 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: #1 |
2013-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2013-01-14 | House | Presented and ordered printed 13103674D |
Subjects
Counties, Cities, and Towns
Drainage, Soil Conservation, Sanitation, and Public Facilities Districts
Highways, Bridges, and Ferries
Public Service Companies
Drainage, Soil Conservation, Sanitation, and Public Facilities Districts
Highways, Bridges, and Ferries
Public Service Companies
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+sum+HB2250 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB2250+hil |