VA HB2258 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2258
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0461)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0461)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Substantial Risk Order Registry; maintenance and access. Authorizes the Department of State Police to release Substantial Risk Order Registry information upon request to institutions of higher education and other research organizations or institutions for the purpose of monitoring and evaluating the impact of substantial risk orders on public safety. The bill requires the Department of State Police to remove the names and other personal identifying information from the data before it releases such information. Substantial Risk Order Registry; maintenance and access. Authorizes the Department of State Police to release Substantial Risk Order Registry information upon request to institutions of higher education and other research organizations or institutions for the purpose of monitoring and evaluating the impact of substantial risk orders on public safety. The bill requires the Department of State Police to remove the names and other personal identifying information from the data before it releases such information.
Title
Substantial Risk Order Registry; maintenance by State Police.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (55-Y 43-N) (Y: 55 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (20-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (18-Y 21-N) (Y: 18 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (8-Y 6-N 1-A) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (56-Y 41-N) (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (20-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (18-Y 21-N) (Y: 18 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (8-Y 6-N 1-A) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (56-Y 41-N) (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0461) | |
2021-03-31 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 461 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-02-25 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 25, 2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2258ER) |
2021-02-22 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-18 | House | VOTE: Adoption (55-Y 43-N) |
2021-02-18 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (55-Y 43-N) |
2021-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (20-Y 19-N) |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Amendments by Senator Morrisey agreed to |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Surovell withdrawn |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Defeated by Senate (18-Y 21-N) |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (8-Y 6-N 1-A) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-03 | House | VOTE: Passage (56-Y 41-N) |
2021-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House (56-Y 41-N) |
2021-02-02 | House | Printed as engrossed 21101516D-E |
2021-02-02 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2258E |
2021-02-02 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2021-02-02 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-29 | House | Reported from Public Safety (14-Y 8-N) |
2021-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Public Safety |
2021-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 2-N) |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2021-01-27 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (15-Y 7-N) |
2021-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Public Safety |
2021-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 2-N) |
2021-01-19 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2021-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2021-01-13 | House | Presented and ordered printed 21101516D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2258 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)