VA HB2265 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0513)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0513)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Cash proffers. Provides that a locality may waive certain written notice requirements in order to reduce, suspend, or eliminate outstanding cash proffer payments for residential construction calculated on a per-dwelling-unit or per-home basis that have been agreed to, but unpaid, by any landowner.
Title
Cash proffers; locality may waive certain written notice requirements to reduce outstanding payment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0513) | |
2013-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 513 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2265ER) |
2013-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (14-Y 1-N) |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-02-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-04 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-01 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-22 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: #2 |
2013-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2013-01-15 | House | Presented and ordered printed 13103137D |