VA HB2270 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Electric utility rate structures; advancing conservation and efficiency. Directs the State Corporation Commission to encourage investor-owned electric utilities to file tariffs with rate structures that reflect time of day and seasonal cost differentials. In proceedings that involve a new or amended retail rate structure, the Commission is directed to consider several factors, including the extent to which the rates are designed to align with the utility's marginal cost of providing service at different times of the day. In such rate structure proceedings, electric utilities may seek, and the Commission may approve, financial incentives for the implementation of creative rate options that would allow the utility and its customers to share the economic benefits of rate structures that lower the utility's fuel costs. The measure also directs the Commission to give the highest level of priority in its development of the electric energy consumer education program to efforts to increase consumer awareness and knowledge of electricity rate structures and the overall cost of electricity.
Title
Electric utility rate structures; advancing conservation and efficiency.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Keam [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | House: Left in Commerce and Labor | |
2011-01-25 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2011-01-18 | House: Assigned C & L sub: #3 Special Subcommittee on Energy | |
2011-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2011-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102597D |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB2270 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB2270+hil |