VA HB2282 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Tax credit for removing barriers at places of public accommodation. Establishes beginning January 1, 2013, an individual and corporate income tax credit equal to 50 percent of the amount paid by a business to remove physical barriers at places of public accommodation, as defined under the Americans with Disabilities Act (e.g., hotels, restaurants, etc.), in order to allow greater access and usage by disabled persons. The credit would not exceed $1,000 in amounts incurred by the business to remove barriers at each place of public accommodation. The Department of Housing and Community Development would administer the tax credit program. Any unused tax credits could be carried forward for five years. The credit would sunset on January 1, 2018.
Title
Income tax, state and corporate; tax credit for removing barriers at places of public accommodation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (3-Y 0-N) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | House | Left in Finance |
2013-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (3-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-22 | House | Assigned Finance sub: #3 |
2013-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2013-01-16 | House | Presented and ordered printed 13103142D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:11 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |