VA HB2289 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0787)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Jurisdiction of claim; plaintiff's motion to amend claim amount; transfer of matter. Provides that, where a matter is pending in either the general district court or the circuit court, upon motion of the plaintiff seeking to amend the amount of the claim, the court shall order transfer of the matter to the court having jurisdiction over the claim without requiring a dismissal of the claim or a nonsuit. The bill further provides that, where such an amended claim provides the general district court and the circuit court with concurrent jurisdiction over such a claim, the court shall transfer the matter to either the general district court or the circuit court, as directed by the plaintiff, provided that such court otherwise has jurisdiction over the matter. The bill further provides that, except for good cause shown, no such order of transfer shall issue unless the motion to amend and transfer is made at least 10 days before trial. The bill further provides that the plaintiff shall pay filing and other fees to the clerk of the court to which the case is transferred, prepare and present the order of transfer to the transferring court for entry, and provide a certified copy of the transfer order to the receiving court.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Jurisdiction of claim; plaintiff's motion to amend claim amount, certified copy of transfer order.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0787)
2019-03-22 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 787 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-28 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-28HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019
2019-02-21SenateSigned by President
2019-02-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-21HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2289ER)
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled
2019-02-18HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 19106908D-S1 (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-14SenatePassed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateEngrossed by Senate - floor substitute HB2289S1
2019-02-14SenateSubstitute by Senator Obenshain agreed to 19106908D-S1
2019-02-14SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-14SenateFloor substitute printed 19106908D-S1 (Obenshain)
2019-02-14SenateRead third time
2019-02-13SenatePassed by for the day
2019-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateReported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-25HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-23HouseRead first time
2019-01-21HouseReported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N)
2019-01-14HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
2019-01-14HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101784D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16177(n/a)See Bill Text
801195.4(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2289
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2289+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2289S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2289ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0787+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0802V0014+HB2289
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0044+HB2289
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV1870+HB2289
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0278+HB2289
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0538HB2289+HB2289
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0633HB2289+HB2289
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2906+HB2289

Bill Comments

feedback