VA HB229 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-09 - Stricken from docket by Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-09 - Stricken from docket by Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Advertisement of legal notices; website. Allows a locality to advertise legal notices on the locality's website instead of, or in addition to, publishing such notices in a newspaper having general circulation in the locality.
Title
Legal notices; locality to advertise on their website.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-09 - House - House: Stricken from docket by Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-09 | House | Stricken from docket by Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-18 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2024-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2024-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24102922D |
Same As/Similar To
SB200 (Similar To) 2024-01-22 - Continued to 2025 in Local Government (13-Y 2-N)