VA HB2293 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; restricted sale of malt beverages. Defines malt beverages and requires the Alcoholic Beverage Control Board to adopt regulations as to the sale and labeling of malt beverages in government stores.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; restricted sale of malt beverages.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | House: Left in General Laws | |
2011-01-27 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2011-01-20 | House: Assigned GL sub: #3 ABC/Gaming | |
2011-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2011-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102918D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
4 | 1 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 111 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 215 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB2293 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB2293+hil |