VA HB2293 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0397)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Electric utilities; stakeholder process for energy efficiency programs. Requires the independent monitor chosen to facilitate the energy efficiency stakeholder process established for the purpose of providing input and feedback on the development of electric utilities' energy efficiency programs to convene meetings of the participants not less frequently than twice each calendar year between July 1, 2019, and July 1, 2028. The measure also requires the independent monitor's report on the status of the stakeholder process to address (i) the objectives established by the stakeholder group during this process related to programs to be proposed, (ii) recommendations related to programs to be proposed that result from the stakeholder process, and (iii) the status of those recommendations. Current law requires that an annual report be submitted by the utility and does not require that it include such information on the stakeholder process. This bill is identical to SB 1605.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electric utilities; stakeholder process for energy efficiency programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0397)
2019-03-14 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 397 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-21 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 21, 2019
2019-02-20SenateSigned by President
2019-02-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-19HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2293ER)
2019-02-19HouseEnrolled
2019-02-14SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateRead third time
2019-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateReported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2293H1
2019-02-04HouseEmergency clause deleted
2019-02-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105505D-H1
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-01-31HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105505D-H1
2019-01-31HouseReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-15HouseAssigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #3
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/09/19 19101763D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2293
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2293+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2293H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2293ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0397+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1403V0012+HB2293
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H14V0033+HB2293
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2381+HB2293
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S02V0128+HB2293
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0547HB2293+HB2293
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0633HB2293+HB2293

Bill Comments

feedback