VA HB2293 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2293
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Local gas severance tax; sunset date. Extends the sunset date from January 1, 2022, to January 1, 2024, for authority to impose an additional local gas severance tax that is dedicated to (i) the local Coal and Gas Road Improvement Fund; (ii) the Virginia Coalfield Economic Development Fund; and (iii) water, sewer, and natural gas systems and lines. Local gas severance tax; sunset date. Extends the sunset date from January 1, 2022, to January 1, 2024, for authority to impose an additional local gas severance tax that is dedicated to (i) the local Coal and Gas Road Improvement Fund; (ii) the Virginia Coalfield Economic Development Fund; and (iii) water, sewer, and natural gas systems and lines.
Title
Local gas severance tax; extends sunset date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Finance (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Finance (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-01 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-29 | House | Engrossed by House |
2021-01-29 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2021-01-29 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-27 | House | Reported from Finance (21-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-23 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2021-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2021-01-16 | House | Presented and ordered printed 21102698D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2293 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)