VA HB2297 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0798)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0798)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Marine Resources Commission; oyster planting grounds; notice of application for lease. Requires the Marine Resources Commission (the Commission) to post notice of an application to lease oyster planting grounds for 30 days on its website and to notify by mail any current holders of adjoining leases, and riparian owners within 200 feet of the selected grounds. Current law requires posting of notice at the local courthouse for 60 days. The bill (i) reduces from four weeks to two weeks the period during which the Commission is required to publish weekly notice of the application in a newspaper and (ii) requires all forms of notice to invite written comments. The bill also provides that the applicant shall bear the cost of notice.
Title
Oyster planting grounds; Marine Resources Commission to post.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0798) | |
2017-04-05 | House | Enacted, Chapter 798 (effective 7/1/17) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2017-04-05 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2017-04-05 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB2297ER2) |
2017-04-05 | House | Reenrolled |
2017-04-05 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-04-05 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-04-05 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-03-20 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2017-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-28 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/28/17 |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2297ER) |
2017-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (9-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-07 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Printed as engrossed 17102816D-E |
2017-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2297E |
2017-02-06 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2017-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-03 | House | Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-25 | House | Assigned App. sub: Commerce, Agriculture, Natural Resources and Technology |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-01-25 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-16 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2017-01-11 | House | Presented and ordered printed 17102816D |
Subjects
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Computer Services and Uses
Fisheries and Habitat of the Tidal Waters
Marine Products Science and Resources
Oysters and Oyster Planting Grounds
Computer Services and Uses
Fisheries and Habitat of the Tidal Waters
Marine Products Science and Resources
Oysters and Oyster Planting Grounds