VA HB2315 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0517)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0517)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Association of Volunteer Rescue Squads; report to the State Emergency Medical Services Advisory Board. Requires the Virginia Association of Volunteer Rescue Squads to submit an annual financial report on the use of funds received from the special emergency medical services fund to the State Emergency Medical Services Advisory Board Executive Committee.
Title
Volunteer Rescue Squads, Va Association of; to submit an annual financial report on use of funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0517) | |
2013-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 517 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2315ER) |
2013-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-02-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-04 | House | Printed as engrossed 13103947D-E |
2013-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2315E |
2013-02-04 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2013-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-31 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-23 | House | Assigned HWI sub: #1 |
2013-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2013-01-18 | House | Presented and ordered printed 13103947D |