VA HB2319 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0737)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0737)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State agency mandates on localities. Provides that the assessment of mandates imposed on local governments currently required include an estimate of the fiscal impact of the mandates on the affected local governments in addition to a written justification as to why the mandate should or should not be eliminated. The bill is identical to
Title
State agency mandates; assessment imposed on local governments.
Sponsors
Del. Kathy Byron [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0737) | |
2011-03-28 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 737 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-03 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2319ER) | |
2011-03-03 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-23 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-23 | House: Senate amendment agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (12-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-08 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2319H1 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11105086D-H1 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-06 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-03 | House: Committee substitute printed 11105086D-H1 | |
2011-02-03 | House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-01 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-20 | House: Assigned GL sub: #4 Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process | |
2011-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2011-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101800D |