VA HB2327 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2327
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Public Procurement Act; requirement to pay prevailing wage; transportation infrastructure projects. Clarifies, for purposes of the requirement under certain circumstances to pay the prevailing wage rate for work performed on public works contracts, that public works includes transportation infrastructure projects.. Virginia Public Procurement Act; requirement to pay prevailing wage; transportation infrastructure projects. Clarifies, for purposes of the requirement under certain circumstances to pay the prevailing wage rate for work performed on public works contracts, that public works includes transportation infrastructure projects..
Title
Prevailing wage rate; clarifies that public works includes transportation infrastructure projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N) (Y: 55 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N) (Y: 55 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-05 | House | VOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N) |
2021-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (55-Y 45-N) |
2021-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2327H1 |
2021-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 21104307D-H1 |
2021-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Committee substitute printed 21104307D-H1 |
2021-02-02 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (13-Y 8-N) |
2021-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) |
2021-01-27 | House | Assigned GL sub: Open Government/Procurement |
2021-01-22 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2021-01-22 | House | Presented and ordered printed 21103463D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2327 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)