VA HB2334 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0358)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Renewable energy power purchase agreements. Directs the State Corporation Commission (SCC) to conduct a pilot program in a certain utility's service territory. Under the pilot program, a person that owns or operates a solar-powered or wind-powered electricity generation facility with a capacity between 50 kilowatts and one megawatt that is located on premises owned or leased by an eligible customer-generator will be allowed to sell the electricity generated from such facility exclusively to the eligible customer-generator under a power purchase agreement. The power purchase agreement will provide for third party financing of the costs of the renewable generation facility. The minimum size requirement does not apply to certain nonprofit entities. The SCC shall establish guidelines concerning aspects of the pilot program by December 1, 2013.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Solar-powered or wind-powered electricity generation facility; SCC to conduct pilot program, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-14 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0358)
2013-03-14 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 358 (effective 7/1/13)
2013-02-22SenateSigned by President
2013-02-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2013-02-21HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2334ER)
2013-02-21HouseEnrolled
2013-02-18HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 1-N)
2013-02-18HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 13105078D-S1 (96-Y 1-N)
2013-02-15HousePlaced on Calendar
2013-02-14SenatePassed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2013-02-14SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2334S1
2013-02-14SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 13105078D-S1
2013-02-14SenateReading of substitute waived
2013-02-14SenateRead third time
2013-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2013-02-11SenateCommittee substitute printed 13105078D-S1
2013-02-11SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2013-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2013-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2013-02-05HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
2013-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2013-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2334H1
2013-02-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 13104712D-H1
2013-02-04HouseRead second time
2013-02-02HouseRead first time
2013-01-31HouseCommittee substitute printed 13104712D-H1
2013-01-31HouseReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
2013-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N)
2013-01-22HouseAssigned C & L sub: Special Subcommittee on Energy
2013-01-18HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2013-01-18HousePresented and ordered printed 13102328D

Same As/Similar To

SB1023 (Same As) 2013-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0382)

Subjects


Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+sum+HB2334
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB2334+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB2334H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB2334S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB2334ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+CHAP0358+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+H1403V0008+HB2334
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+H14V0081+HB2334
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+HV0607+HB2334
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+S02V0126+HB2334
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+SV0491HB2334+HB2334
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+SV0530HB2334+HB2334
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+HV1020+HB2334

Bill Comments

feedback