VA HB2343 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0798)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0798)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Mutual liability for necessaries; furnishing of medical care. Provides that liability shall not be imposed upon one spouse for medical care furnished to the patient spouse when such patient spouse predeceases the nonpatient spouse. Mutual liability for necessaries; furnishing of medical care. Provides that liability shall not be imposed upon one spouse for medical care furnished to the patient spouse when such patient spouse predeceases the nonpatient spouse.
Title
Mutual liability for necessaries; furnishing of health care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Adoption (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Adoption (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-12 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0798) | |
2023-04-12 | House | Enacted, Chapter 798 (effective 7/1/23) |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2023-04-12 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2023-04-12 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB2343ER2) |
2023-04-12 | House | Reenrolled |
2023-04-12 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-04-12 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Adoption (95-Y 0-N) |
2023-04-12 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) |
2023-04-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-03-26 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-16 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2343ER) |
2023-02-16 | House | Enrolled |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-01-27 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-27 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-26 | House | Engrossed by House |
2023-01-26 | House | Read second time |
2023-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-23 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-19 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2023-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2023-01-12 | House | Presented and ordered printed 23103589D |