VA HB238 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0595)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0595)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Management of blue crabs. Limits the Marine Resources Commission's fisheries management authority in the Albemarle and Currituck watersheds to the recreational and commercial harvest of blue crab.
Title
Blue crabs; Marine Resources Commission to manage harvesting in Albemarle and Currituck counties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0595) | |
2012-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 595 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-10 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-09 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-09 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB238ER) | |
2012-03-09 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-03-06 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-06 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-03-05 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-14 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-14 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB238H1 | |
2012-02-13 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 12105079D-H1 | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-10 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2012-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-08 | House: Committee substitute printed 12105079D-H1 | |
2012-02-08 | House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-18 | House: Assigned ACNRsub: Chesapeake | |
2012-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2012-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101140D |
Subjects
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Fisheries and Habitat of Tidal Waters
Game, Inland Fisheries, and Boating
Fisheries and Habitat of Tidal Waters
Game, Inland Fisheries, and Boating