VA HB2406 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0507)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0507)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; Town of South Boston. Alters the method of filling vacancies on council and in the office of mayor so as to conform to state law. Other changes include updating Code references and allowing for incorporation of state law by reference.
Title
Charter; Town of South Boston.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0507) | |
2011-03-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 507 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-25 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-25 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-25 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2406ER) | |
2011-02-25 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-17 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-15 | Senate: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-08 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-02-06 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-04 | House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-20 | House: Assigned CC & T sub: #1 | |
2011-01-17 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2011-01-17 | House: Presented and ordered printed 11103196D |