VA HB2421 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adoption procedures. Makes numerous changes to adoption procedures including (i) providing that venue for a parental placement adoption consent hearing lies in any city or county in the Commonwealth; (ii) providing that juvenile and domestic relations district courts have jurisdiction over petitions to review an adoption home study and petitions for the court to assist with the execution of another state's or jurisdiction's adoption consent or related document; (iii) under what conditions parental consent is not required for an adoption of a child from another country whose foreign placement will be finalized in the Commonwealth; and (iv) providing that procedures used in parental placement adoptions apply in all cases, except step-parent, relative, and agency placements. The bill also provides that a birth parent's consent to an adoption is not required if he has not visited or contacted the child for six months immediately prior to the filing of the petition for adoption or prior to any adoption-related proceeding in the juvenile and domestic relations district court where the birth parent has been notified of the Putative Father Registry or other adoption-related proceeding or has been contacted for the purpose of seeking his cooperation in a future adoption proceeding. Current law only provides that the birth parent's consent is not required if he had not visited or contacted the child for six months prior to the filing of the petition for adoption.
Title
Adoption procedures; makes numerous changes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee for Courts of Justice (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | House: Left in Courts of Justice | |
2011-02-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2011-01-27 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #2 Civil | |
2011-01-27 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-27 | House: Referred from Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote | |
2011-01-26 | House: Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee for Courts of Justice (8-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-26 | House: Assigned HWI sub: #2 | |
2011-01-18 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2011-01-18 | House: Presented and ordered printed 11103720D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 241 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 243 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1230 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1250 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |