VA HB2449 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0541)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0541)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Term limits; certain public bodies in City of Chesapeake. Provides that members of the Chesapeake Economic Development Authority, Chesapeake Redevelopment and Housing Authority, Chesapeake Airport Authority, and Chesapeake Hospital Authority shall be limited to two terms. The bill provides that members of such authorities serve at the pleasure of the city council and that no member shall work for an authority within one year of serving as a member of that authority. This bill is identical to SB 1553.
Title
Term limits; members of certain Authorities in City of Chesapeake limited to two terms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (0-Y 96-N 1-A) (Y: 0 N: 96 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 3-N 1-A) (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (0-Y 96-N 1-A) (Y: 0 N: 96 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 3-N 1-A) (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0541) | |
2017-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 541 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-03-13 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/13/17 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2449ER) |
2017-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-24 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 2-N 1-A) |
2017-02-24 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (91-2-N 1-A) |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-24 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senators: Cosgrove, Stanley, Spruill |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2017-02-23 | House | Delegates: Knight, Stolle, Lindsey |
2017-02-23 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2017-02-23 | House | House acceded to request |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate insisted on amendments (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N 1-A) |
2017-02-21 | House | Senate amendments rejected by House (0-Y 96-N 1-A) |
2017-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Local Government with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-07 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 3-N 1-A) |
2017-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House (92-Y 3-N 1-A) |
2017-02-06 | House | Printed as engrossed 17103897D-E |
2017-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2449E |
2017-02-06 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2017-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-03 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (20-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-24 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2017-01-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2017-01-20 | House | Presented and ordered printed 17103897D |